judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HELEN MCKINNON V. PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0468
Short Caption:HELEN MCKINNON V. PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM6480-09Filed Date:04/07/2011

Opening Event Date:04/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/07/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHelen Mckinnon N
Noah ClementsYY
AppelleeProvidence HospitalN
Eric W. GundersonYY
Hubert W. FarrellNN
AppelleeGail Pearson N
Donald M. TempleYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 7, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partialtranscripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX
05/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to July 25, 2011 (no oppo). (Appellant)
07/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/25/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until Sept. 6, 2011 (Appellee Providence Hospital)Granted
08/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until Sept. 6, 2011 (Appellee Providence Hospital)
08/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Pearson)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Providence Hospital)
09/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/26/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - to supplement the record (Appellee Providence Hospital)Denied
11/03/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion For Leave to File - to supplement the record (Appellee Providence Hospital)
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/17/2012FiledLetter - Atty Gunderson will argue in place of Atty Farrell. (Appellee Providence Hospital)
03/22/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, thompson, Schwelb
03/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
05/07/2012FiledMandate