judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAMMY LYNN RAMOS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0106)
Case Number:S-10-0106Case Docketed On:05/10/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:TAMMY LYNN RAMOS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TAMMY LYNN RAMOS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTammy Lynn Ramos Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2010 WY 125
Citation:242 P.3d 65 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/10/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/28/2010Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
06/28/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/28/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2010Correspondence - Incoming - from Ms. Ramos - not distributed to court, but copy given to Staff Attorney.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/13/2010Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
08/31/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
09/08/2010Opinion - Published order - Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
09/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/24/2010Record - Returned unfiled recordRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
09/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/24/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/27/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal