Case Information: 11-CV-0461 | |||
Short Caption: | UNITED STATES V. LAFAIRE MUNFORD ET AL. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LTB43321-08 | Filed Date: | 04/08/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/08/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 05/06/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/19/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | United States | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Lafaire Munford | Y |
| ||||||
Appellee | Clark Realty Management, LLC | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/08/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
05/02/2011 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 8, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3(A). (JAC) elp | |||
05/06/2011 | RECORD INDEX | |||
05/06/2011 | RECORD COPIES | |||
05/06/2011 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
05/09/2011 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp | |||
06/06/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO to 7/20/11 | |||
06/09/2011 | On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 20, 2011. (JAC) elp | |||
07/20/2011 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant) | Granted | |
07/28/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant) | ||
07/28/2011 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
08/19/2011 | Filed | Mandate |