judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRAMANZ VS. GRAMANZ

Case Information: 33602
Short Caption:GRAMANZ VS. GRAMANZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A322062Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Leavitt, RoseCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Singer, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 14188.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00232
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael H. Singer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/01/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: 1/28/99). 99-00680
02/19/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Association of Counsel. Robert L. Eisenberg associated as counsel for appellant. 99-01154
02/23/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter. Singer. (Notice of Association of Counsel.)
03/09/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Petition. 99-01650
03/15/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter from Settlement Judge Singer to counsel. The settlement conference is stayed. 99-01840
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 9, 1999, appellants filed a notice that appellant Brent Gramanz filed a voluntary petition for Chapter 11 bankruptcy. Because Brent Gramanz was a plaintiff in the action below, this appeal is not subject to the automatic bankruptcy stay. This appeal is not stayed and the settlement judge may continue with the settlement conference proceedings. 99-02378
08/10/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter to Supreme Court and all attorneys regarding settlement conference. 99-07377
11/04/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: to a date not later than December 15, 1999. 99-10818
11/19/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address for law firm of Harrison, Kemp & Jones. 99-11570
12/01/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address for law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg. 99-11999
03/01/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-03229
03/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 00-03858
03/13/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
03/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 00-04532
04/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Regarding Order to Show Cause. 00-05800
04/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to respond to the order to show cause. 00-06180
05/16/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Second Extension of Time Regarding Order to Show Cause. 00-08169
05/23/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
05/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. On May 16, 2000, two days before their respone was due, appellants filed a motion for a second extension of time to file a response. Apparently, appellant Brent Gramanz filed a voluntary petition for bankruptcy on February 25, 1999. However, the bankruptcy action appears to be unrelated to the jurisdictional issue addressed in our order to show cause. Appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file their response to this court's March 22, 2000, order to show cause. No further extensions will be permitted. If appellants fail to file a response on that date, this court will treat that failure as an admission that this court lack jurisdiction over the appeal and a conset to dismissal. 00-09009
06/12/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-09915
06/12/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-09916
06/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We approve the stipulation to voluntarily dismiss this appeal and we ORDER this appeal dismissed."NNP99B-WM/CY/DA 00-11259