judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LABORERS ON THE WAY, LLC V. UNITED BANK KARPOFF & TITLE

Case Information: 11-CV-0471
Short Caption:LABORERS ON THE WAY, LLC V. UNITED BANK KARPOFF & TITLEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB406-07Filed Date:04/12/2011

Opening Event Date:04/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:09/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLaborers on the Way LLCN
Matthew August LefandeYY
AppelleeGlen Construction Company IncorporatedN
Julian Karpoff YN
AppelleeUnited BankN
Julian Karpoff NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/12/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 12, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
05/04/2011TMC - motion for summary reversal - oppo & motion for summary affirmance - reply & oppo to summary affirmance - reply to oppo
05/12/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE - AND aple's opposition to aplt's motion for summary reversal
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY - to aple's opposition to aplt's motion for summary reversal AND opposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance
05/31/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY- to aplt's opposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance
06/30/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED...It is ***MORE***
06/30/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED. It is ***MORE****
06/30/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GLRDTE)
07/11/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledRecord Index
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (12-pgs/tape 10/23/08 proc.)
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (26-pgs/johnson 6/18/09 proc.)
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (107-pgs/johnson 8/18/09 proc.)
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4(49-pgs/maar 1/19/10 proc.)
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (4-pgs/gilliam 5/27/10 proc.)
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record#6 (7-pgs/janifer 8/10/10 proc.)
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record #7 (5-pgs/tape 10/19/10 proc.) w/cd
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/04/2011FiledStatement regarding consent motion (Appellant)
08/08/2011FiledOpposition to consent motion. (Appellee)
08/17/2011FiledReceived amended consent motion (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/19/2011FiledOrder Denying Appellant's Consent Motion and Amended Consent Motion and Directing Appellee's Briefs within 30 days from the order.
09/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/30/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/25/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/03/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Oberly, Reid
04/03/2012FiledArgued Before Thompson,Oberly,Reid Matthew August Lefande Esq.,for appellant. Julian Karpoff Esq.,for appellee.
04/05/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
05/08/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee United Bank)Denied Without Prejudice
05/08/2012FiledOpposition to applellee's motion for Attorney's fees on appeal. (Appellant)
05/08/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/15/2012FiledReply to appellant's oppositon to appelle's motion for award of attorney fee on appeal (Appellant)
05/24/2012FiledORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IS DENIED W/O PREJUDICE TO REFILING ONCE THE PETITION FOR REHEARING/EN BANC HAS BEEN RESOLVED
09/04/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
09/12/2012FiledMandate
09/13/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee United Bank)Referred
09/17/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR COSTS//OPPO//MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY
09/19/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's renewed motion for an award of attorney's fees on appeal (Appellee United Bank) *****REFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT
10/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to file reply to appellant's opposition to appellee's motion for award of attorney fees on appeal Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee United Bank)( Glen Consruction Company Inc.)Granted
11/09/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE the LODGED REPLY and FURTHER ORDERED that the CLERK SHALL TRANSMIT A COPY OF ***THE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, THE OPPOSITION AND THE REPLY to SUPERIOR COURT FOR RESOLUTION
11/09/2012FiledReply (Appellee)*****REFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT