judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTHONY HOWARD CARR v. JEAN ROSE SUTTER

Case Heading (S-11-0255)
Case Number:S-11-0255Case Docketed On:10/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ANTHONY HOWARD CARR v. JEAN ROSE SUTTER
Full Title:ANTHONY HOWARD CARR, Appellant (Defendant), v. JEAN ROSE SUTTER, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnthony Howard CarrGuy Patrick Cleveland
AppelleeJean Rose SutterLinda J. Steiner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
10/28/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
10/28/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/29/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - received email indicating that the case has been settled and will be voluntarily dismissed.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/16/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
12/16/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
01/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal