Case Information: 15-CM-1370 | |||
Short Caption: | REGINA A. WILKINS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DVM884-15 | Filed Date: | 12/18/2015 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/18/2015 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 02/23/2016 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/11/2016 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/24/2017 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/05/2017 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/18/2015 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
01/13/2016 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
01/13/2016 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Geneva Vanderhorst, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
02/01/2016 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (rt ordered/needed)de | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #1 (7 pages/tape) 5/9/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (12 pages/tape) 5/26/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (18 pages/tape) 7/10/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (25 pages/tape) 9/18/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (122 pages/tape) 9/21/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (143 pages/tape) 9/22/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #7 (98 pages/tape) 10/20/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #8 (109 pages/tape) 10/21/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #9 (62 pages/tape) 10/26/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #10 (54 pages/tape) 11/10/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #11 (34 pages/tape) 11/18/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #12 (22 pages/tape) 12/10/15 proceeding | ||
02/23/2016 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/01/2016 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
03/11/2016 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
03/11/2016 | Filed | Record Index | ||
04/19/2016 | Filed | Order directing counsel for appellant to submit brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time within 20 days from the date of this order. | ||
05/20/2016 | Filed | Order directing counsel for appellant to submit brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time within 15 days from the date of this order. | ||
05/23/2016 | Filed | Motion For Leave to late file the motion to extend time to file brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
05/23/2016 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File a response to the Court's order dated April 19, 2016 (Appellant) | Granted | |
06/16/2016 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged response, granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix, filing the lodged brief and limited appendix and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 11, 2016 | ||
06/16/2016 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
06/16/2016 | Filed | Response to Court's order dated April 19, 2016 (Appellant) | ||
06/16/2016 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
06/16/2016 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
07/11/2016 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
07/11/2016 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
08/16/2016 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
09/07/2016 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file reply brief and filing the lodged reply brief | ||
09/07/2016 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
10/17/2016 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
12/06/2016 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
01/24/2017 | Filed | Submitted To Associate Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Senior Judge Pryor. | ||
03/06/2017 | Filed | Change Of Address received by Geneva Vanderhorst | ||
05/12/2017 | Filed | Affirmed by MOJ (Blackburne-Rigsby, Glickman, Pryor) | ||
06/05/2017 | Filed | Mandate | ||
06/24/2017 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) |