judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOYCE LITTLE V. JULIO CASTILLO

Case Information: 11-DA-0009
Short Caption:JOYCE LITTLE V. JULIO CASTILLOClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Lead: 11-DA-0007 Consolidated:11-DA-0009, 11-DA-0010
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC4-6-11Filed Date:04/12/2011

Opening Event Date:04/12/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJoyce Little NPro SeN
RespondentJulio Castillo NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/12/2011APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL (RECVD ONLY)
05/11/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged AAA's, NPT, to April 4, 2011 and April 12, 2011, respecitively. It is ****MORE****
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that these matters are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is ****MORE******
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER shall w/n 20 days SHOW CAUSE why these applications should not be dismissed either for LACK OF JURISDICTION...OR for having been PREMATURELY FLED....It is FURTHER ORDERED that PETTIONER SHALL SHOW CAUSE why these applications should not be dismissed AS MOOT... SEE HARDCOPY (BY: ETW)
05/11/2011TMC - OTSC
06/23/2011 ORDERED that these AAA's ARE HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BRNBKG)