Case Heading (S-10-0098) | |||||
Case Number: | S-10-0098 | Case Docketed On: | 05/04/2010 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | CAROL JOHNSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION | ||||
Full Title: | CAROL JOHNSON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Carol Johnson | Kenneth Bert DeCock |
Appellee | Department of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Bruce A. Salzburg John William Renneisen James Michael Causey Kelly Roseberry |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Workers' Compensation |
Opinion Number: | 2010 WY 166 |
Citation: | 244 P.3d 491 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
05/04/2010 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
05/04/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
05/04/2010 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
05/04/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
05/14/2010 | Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other -Order Appointing Attorney | Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies | Other | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District Court | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final | |
06/10/2010 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/11/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs | Notice-Incoming | Statement of costs | Final | |
06/14/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Statement of Costs and Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/15/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received Appellant Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/21/2010 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
07/21/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/27/2010 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
08/09/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/11/2010 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
08/13/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
08/13/2010 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/13/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
08/31/2010 | Event - Expedited Assignment | Event | Brief Only Assignment | Final | |
12/17/2010 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
12/21/2010 | Motion - Fees and costs | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
12/23/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/19/2011 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/19/2011 | Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs | Order | Awarding attorney fees and costs | Final | |
01/19/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
01/19/2011 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
01/19/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
01/21/2011 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/20/2011. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |