judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD (DALE) VS. STATE C/W 38435

Case Information: 38455
Short Caption:WARD (DALE) VS. STATE C/W 38435Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 38435 *, 38455Related Case(s): 34958
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991291Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-15283
09/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 9/12/01. 01-15578
11/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 01-19315
11/28/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 38435/38455. 01-19895
12/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. On November 28, 2001, the parties to these appeals filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. The stipulation is approved and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Nos. 38435/38455. (01-20736)
08/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals from an order of the district court denying appellant Dale Walter Ward's post-conviction petitions for writs of habeas corpus. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 38435/38455 02-13947
09/10/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14174
09/10/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2002. 02-14174