Case Heading (S-10-0097) | |||||
Case Number: | S-10-0097 | Case Docketed On: | 04/29/2010 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | JUSTIN DANIEL BREAZEALE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | JUSTIN DANIEL BREAZEALE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Justin Daniel Breazeale | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Eric M. Alden |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Jenny Lynn Craig |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2011 WY 10 |
Citation: | 245 P.3d 834 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/29/2010 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/29/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/29/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/16/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/16/2010 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
07/29/2010 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/02/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/05/2010 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
08/10/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jenny L. Craig to appear on behalf of Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
08/16/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
08/16/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny L. Craig for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
08/16/2010 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
08/17/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/23/2010 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes, (Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volumes III & IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential File) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/23/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Record filed | Notice-Outgoing | Record filed | Final | |
09/22/2010 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
09/23/2010 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
01/24/2011 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
02/09/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
02/09/2011 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
02/09/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
02/09/2011 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
02/14/2011 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/11/2011. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |