judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: BERNICE T. SUTER; WILLIAM N. SUTER, APLT

Case Information: 11-PR-0453
Short Caption:IN RE: BERNICE T. SUTER; WILLIAM N. SUTER, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:INT416-10Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam N. Suter, IIINPro SeN
AppelleeBernice T. Suter N
Beverly Henderson NN
AppelleeJoseph Suter N
Roy R. Morris NN
AppelleePatricia Dodson N
Roy R. Morris NN
AppelleeBarbara Hargrove NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 6, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/18/11, 3/8/11 & 3/9/11) (elp)
05/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (29-pgs/linsey 2/17/11 proc.)
05/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (200-pgs/van bremen 3/8/11 proc.)
05/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (36-pgs/van bremen 3/9/11)w/cd
05/23/2011RECORD INDEX
05/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that Beverly Henderson, Esquire, was appointed by the trial court to represent appellee Bernice T. Sutler in this matter, and on further consideration of the briefing order issued by this court on June 9, 2011, it is ORDERED that Beverly Henderson, Esquire, is assigned as counsel for appellee Bernice T. Sutler in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix remain due to be filed with this court on or before July 19, 2011. (ETW) elp
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal (Appellant)Denied
07/19/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL;APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS;OPPO; MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPO (SUM REV); OPPO TO MXOP; MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE-OPPO
07/25/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee Suter)Denied
08/08/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion to dismiss the appeal and request to grant motion for summary reversal as conceded (Appellant)
08/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - an opposition to aplt's motion for summary reversal (Appellee William Suter)Granted
08/16/2011FiledOpposition to motion for leave to file out of time (Appellant)
08/26/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL and DENYING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS and...
11/30/2011FiledGRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and the CLERK WILL FILE APPELLEE'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and the MOTION IS HELD IN ABEYANCE and...
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee Suter)Held in Abeyance
11/30/2011FiledORDERED JOSEPH SUTER and PATRICIA DODSON SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/14/2011FiledAnswer/Response to aple's cross-motion for summary affirmance. (Appellee Suter, Appellee Dodson)
12/16/2011FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (IN ABEYANCE)//APPELLANT'S OPPO//SUTTER & DODSON'S RESPONSE
12/16/2011FiledBrief (no appdx) (Appellant)
12/20/2011FiledOrder Granting Summary Affirmance
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
01/03/2012LodgedAnswer/Response to aple's cross-motion for Summary Affirmance. (Appellant Suter, Appellee Dodson)
01/11/2012FiledMandate
03/09/2012FiledMotion for extension of time to file bill of costs (Appellee Suter)Granted
03/12/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED BILL OF COSTS
04/04/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and the CLERK SHALL FILE APPELEE'S PETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES and TRANSMIT A COPY TO SUPERIOR COURT FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS
04/04/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee Suter)