judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEREJE SEIFU V. RIVERSIDE CONDOMINIUM UNIT OWNERS ASSOCIATION, ET AL.,

Case Information: 15-CV-0248
Short Caption:DEREJE SEIFU V. RIVERSIDE CONDOMINIUM UNIT OWNERS ASSOCIATION, ET AL.,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Real Property (CAR)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR6795-11Filed Date:03/04/2015

Opening Event Date:03/04/2015Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/04/2015Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/05/2016
Argued/Submitted:05/10/2017
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/28/2017

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDereje SeifuN
William PayneYY
AppelleeRiverside Condominium Unit Owners AssociationN
Jane Saindon RogersYN
AppelleeElias EndaleNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2015FiledNotice Of Appeal
03/25/2015FiledInitial Order
04/06/2015FiledReceived on 4/3/15 - ORDER dated 3/25/15, mailed to appellee Elias Endale at the most current address on docket 1512 Rhode Island Avenue NE. Washington, DC 20018, and returned by U.S.P.S. this date as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files. elp (Appellee Endale)
04/13/2015FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant Seifu, Appellee Endale)
05/05/2015FiledRecord Index
07/17/2015FiledOrder that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, advise this court as to the status of transcripts.
07/27/2015FiledReceived - Order dated 7/17/15, mailed to appellee Elias Endale at his most current address on the docket 1512 Rhode Island Avenue NW, Washington DC 20018, and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date (Appellee Endale)
07/27/2015FiledStatement regarding status of transcripts (Appellant)
08/04/2015FiledSupplemental Record#1 (116-pgs/Johnson 2/2/15 proceeding)
08/04/2015FiledSupplemental Record #2 (156-pgs/Johnson 2/3/15 proceeding)
08/04/2015FiledRecord Completed
08/20/2015FiledBriefing Order
09/02/2015FiledReceived on 8/31/15- ORDER dated 8/20/15, mailed to appellee Elias Endale to 1512 Rhode Island Avenue NE, Washington, DC 20018, the most current address on the docket and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date. (Appellee Endale)
09/29/2015FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/14/2015FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/28/2015FiledReceived - ORDER dated 10/14/15, mailed to appellee Elias Endale at 1512 Rhode Island Avenue NE, Washington, DC 20018 and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files (Appellee Endale)
10/28/2015FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/28/2015FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/24/2015FiledChange Of Address Received From Jane Saindon Rogers
12/02/2015FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO
12/07/2015FiledOpposition to appellee's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
04/11/2016FiledOrder To Show Cause (within 10 days) why appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a non-final/non-appealable order.
04/21/2016FiledResponse To Order To Show Cause (Appellant)
04/25/2016FiledOrder that appellee's motion for summary affirmance is held in abeyance; FO appellant shall in 30 days from date of this order to file a status statement on motion filed in Superior Court. Appellant shall notify this court within 10 days after the judgment is amended.
04/29/2016FiledReceived - Order dated 4/11/16, mailed to appellee Elias Endale at his most current address on the docket 1512 Rhode Island Avenue NW, Washington DC 20018, and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date (Appellee Endale) (Appellee Endale)
05/25/2016FiledStatement pursuant to court's order 4/25/16 (Appellant)
05/31/2016FiledMotion to file amended statement of status. (Appellant)
08/17/2016FiledOrder to file a status statement in 30 days & if appeal has not ripened, this case will be dismissed without prejudice to filing new appeal once final order has issued
09/16/2016FiledLetter From appellant pursuant to order August 17, 2015 regarding status of motion to amend the underlining Judgment order dated 2/3/15 (Appellant)
10/04/2016FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee Riverside Condominium Unit Owners Association)Denied
10/04/2016FiledOrder Denying appellee's motion for summary affirmance; FO appellee (Riverside) brief due within 30 days from date of this order
11/04/2016FiledBrief (Appellee Riverside Condominium Unit Owners Association)
11/04/2016FiledAppendix (Appellee Riverside Condominium Unit Owners Association)
12/05/2016FiledOrdered that because order to appellee Elias Endale was returned as "undeliverable" and he has not provided Court with mailing address, this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division on the record and the appellate briefs on file
12/05/2016FiledBriefing Completed
12/16/2016FiledReceived - Order dated 12/5/16, mailed to appellee Elias Endale, and returned by U.S.P.S. as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date (Appellee Endale)
01/10/2017FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
04/03/2017FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/10/2017FiledSubmitted to Associate Judges Thompson, McLeese, and Senior Judge Reid
08/04/2017FiledAffirmed by MOJ
08/28/2017FiledMandate