judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WALES TRUCKING COMPANY v. LOUIS STALLCUP, ET AL.

Case: B-2718
B-2718
05/05/1971
Application for Writ of Error
WALES TRUCKING COMPANY
LOUIS STALLCUP, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/08/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/26/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/05/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/1971Response to Motion filed
12/08/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/24/1971Opinion issued
07/21/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/21/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/21/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/26/1971Response to Petition
05/20/1971Response to Petition
05/05/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/05/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wales Trucking CompanyPetitioner
Louis Stallcup, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information