judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAUSCHER VS. MIRAGE

Case Information: 38426
Short Caption:RAUSCHER VS. MIRAGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A426659Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert G. Giunta--check no. 1613.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14895
09/10/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15215
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Letter from Settlement Judge Robinson indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-16355
09/28/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Robert Giunta advising the court that this case has settled. 01-16357
10/08/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-16838
10/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 01-17916
10/24/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.