judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WENDY WILLIS, f/k/a WENDY DAVIS v. CHAD DAVIS

Case Heading (S-10-0066)
Case Number:S-10-0066Case Docketed On:03/31/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:WENDY WILLIS, f/k/a WENDY DAVIS v. CHAD DAVIS
Full Title:WENDY WILLIS, f/k/a WENDY DAVIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. CHAD DAVIS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWendy WillisAlex Hellmuth Sitz III
AppelleeChad DavisMatthew David Winslow

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Res judicata/Collateral estoppel
Opinion Number:2010 WY 149
Citation:243 P.3d 568 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/31/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/12/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/20/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Matthew Winslow for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Alex H. Sitz, III for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Alex H. Sitz, III for appellant; Matthew D. Winslow for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/06/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/06/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/10/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/8/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal