judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANE DECORDOVA OWENS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0423
Short Caption:DANE DECORDOVA OWENS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-15838-09Filed Date:03/31/2011

Opening Event Date:03/31/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/05/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:11/04/2013
Argued/Submitted:04/24/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/20/2020

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Demian S. AhnYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/31/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire
05/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (80pgs/Van Bremen) 11/8/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (40pgs/Van Bremen) 11/10/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (459pgs/Peterson-Hart) 11/15-17/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (64pgs/Coney) 11/17/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (164pgs/Peterson-Hart) 11/18/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (7pgs/Van Bremen) 11/19/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (17pgs/Kaczorowski) 11/22/10 proc. w/cd
06/17/2011RECORD INDEX
06/17/2011RECORD COPIES
06/29/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
08/17/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to file brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 20 days.
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until December 1, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
09/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 12/1/11.
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/15/12.
01/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 29, 2012. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/29/12.
03/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
03/30/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (for RT reasons)
07/03/2012LodgedMotion to discharge counsel form further representation and to appoint new counsel (Appellant)
07/05/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (30 pgs/Bankins) 3/18/11 proc. w/cd
07/05/2012FiledRECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2012FiledBriefing Order
07/23/2012FiledLetter To Mindy Daniels, Esq., re: letter from Dane Owens requesting new counsel
08/14/2012FiledLetter From Counsel regarding Appellant's complaint to the court. (Appellant)
09/04/2012FiledLetter From Appellant inquiring about a directive to respond to the motion to discharge counsel and request for any motion or responses filed by CJA counsel (Appellant)
09/07/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/n 20 days.
09/10/2012FiledLetter To Mindy Daniels, Esq., re: the 9/4/12 letter from appellant Dane Owens
10/01/2012FiledLetter From Attorney Daniels apprising the court of her attempt to make contact with appellant. (Appellant)
10/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/30/12
12/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/14/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 2/10/13
01/31/2013FiledLetter From Appellant requesting the withdrawl of current counsel (Appellant)
02/15/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until March 8, 2013 (Appellant)Granted
02/26/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until March 8, 2013 (Appellant)
03/13/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/19/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 4/8/13
04/17/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until April 29, 2013 (Appellant)Granted
05/08/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/13/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motions For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/20/13.
06/04/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/14/2013FiledGRANT - Order GrantingMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 7/1/13
07/17/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/24/2013FiledLetter From Appellant due to lack of communication with counsel and to reappointment of new counsel (Appellant)
07/26/2013FiledLetter From Clerk of the Court addressing Attorney Mindy Daniels. (Appellant)
08/01/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/08/2013FiledResponse To Order To Show Cause (Appellant)
08/13/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/16/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/20/2013FiledLetter From Attorney Daniels regarding her recent correspondence with Owens (Appellant)
08/21/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days
08/21/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/21/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/19/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/27/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to October 22, 2013.
10/17/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
10/21/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 11/4/13
11/04/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/04/2013FiledBriefing Completed
11/04/2013FiledMotion to supplement the record with electronic exhibit (CD/DVD) (attached) (Appellee)Granted
11/22/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion to supplement the record with electronic exhibit (CD/DVD) (attached) (Appellee)
12/02/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
12/03/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/09/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (government exhibit #107)
02/27/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/07/2014FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/21/2014FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
04/21/2014FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/24/2014FiledArgued Before Chief Judge Washington, Associate Judge Fisher, Senior Judge Newman (Mindy A. Daniels, Esq.) (Demian S. Ahn, Esq.)
08/07/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge; Fisher, Associate Judge; and Newman, Senior Judge)
08/18/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
08/25/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to October 13, 2014.
10/14/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
12/16/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
12/22/2014FiledMotion To Stay Issuance Of The Mandate (Appellant)
03/24/2015LodgedNotice of filing of Petition for Writ of Certiorari (Appellant)
04/24/2015FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
05/04/2015LodgedReceived - notice of denial of petition for writ of cert (Appellant)
05/06/2015FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/20/2020FiledMandate