judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES S. FERNANDEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0422
Short Caption:CHARLES S. FERNANDEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-9327-10Filed Date:03/31/2011

Opening Event Date:03/31/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/2012
Argued/Submitted:02/05/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/29/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles S. Fernandez Y
Donna L. BidermanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elana SuttenbergYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/31/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Donna L. Biderman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Donna L. Biderman, Esquire
05/24/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
05/24/2011RECEIVED - statement re transcript.
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (Castillo)
05/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (124 pgs/Graybill) 1/13-14/11 proc.
07/07/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/20/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/21/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/21/2011FiledRecord Index
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (SEALED pleadings)
08/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix
11/09/2011FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/in 15 days.
11/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 12/19/11.
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court.
05/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (9 pgs/Graybill) 1/13/11 proc w/cd
06/27/2012FiledBriefing Order
08/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/16/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and the lodged brief and limited appendix of appellant are filed.
08/16/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) appendix attached to brief
09/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 10/17/12.
10/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/17/2012FiledBriefing Completed
11/28/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
12/21/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/05/2013FiledSubmitted To Judges Glickman,Thompson,Reid,
08/07/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
08/29/2013FiledMandate