judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GWINNER VS. GWINNER

Case Information: 38425
Short Caption:GWINNER VS. GWINNERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800780DClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jeffrey Friedman, Ltd.--check no. 6121.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14879
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement . Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-18944
01/24/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement or otherwise communicate with this court. We again direct appellant to file and serve the docketing statement within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the immediate imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 02-01650
01/31/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-02093
03/18/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Allow Late Filing of Docketing Statement. 02-04805
03/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 60 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal and to remand this matter to the district court, accompanied by an order of the district court certifying its intention to grant the parties' requested relief pursuant to Huneycutt. If appellant is unable to obtain Huneycutt certification, he shall so inform this court within the same time period. We approve the parties' stipulation to allow the late filing of appellant's docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on March 8, 2002. 02-05129
03/22/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-04180
08/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not complied with or otherwise responded to our March 22, 2002 order. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-13909
09/10/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14168
09/10/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 11, 2002. 02-14168