judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH ALAN EGAN v. KORI KAE EGAN

Case Heading (S-10-0065)
Case Number:S-10-0065Case Docketed On:03/31/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JOSEPH ALAN EGAN v. KORI KAE EGAN
Full Title:JOSEPH ALAN EGAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. KORI KAE EGAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph Alan EganAlex Hellmuth Sitz III
AppelleeKori Kae Egan Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support
Opinion Number:2010 WY 164
Citation:244 P.3d 1045 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/31/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/01/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for AppelleeEventPhone CallFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/28/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
05/24/2010Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel to request hard copies not receivedEventPhone CallFinal
05/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - ErrataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/15/2010Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
06/16/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant re brief of appellee. Advised counsel that brief was received today and was untimely.EventPhone CallFinal
06/17/2010Event - Rejected Filing. Returned untimely brief of appellee.EventRejected FilingFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/21/2010Motion - Accept late filing - brief of appelleeMotionAccept late filingFinal
06/21/2010Event - Phone Call. Contacted Mr. Simonton regarding his representation of appellee. He is not counsel on appeal and will file a motion to withdraw.EventPhone CallFinal
06/22/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counsel for AppelleeMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/22/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Exhibit; Volume IV, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/02/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee re rejected e-filing. Hard copies receivedEventPhone CallFinal
07/06/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to motion for extensionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/13/2010Order - Denying Consideration of Appellee's Brief and Order Granting Counsel's Motion to WithdrawOrderDenyFinal
07/13/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/15/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal