judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PARKS (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33605
Short Caption:PARKS (LAWRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38194
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140785Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/18/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00235
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33353, 33491, 33566, 33580, 33582, 33604, 33605, 33727. 99-01430
06/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-05288
06/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP
02/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be remanded to the district court for an evidentiary hearing to determine whether or not counsel's performance fell below an objective standard of rreasonableness. 01-02522
03/12/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-04372
03/14/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Lawrence Seville Parks. Returned, unfiled proper person documents received on March 12, 2001.
04/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand in Part, and Affirmance in Part. "ORDER the judgment of the district court regarding appellant's Lozada claim REVERSED AND REMANDED WITH INSTRUCTIONS to the district court to conduct an evidentiary hearing and further proceedings consistent with this order and AFFIRM the remaining parts of the district court order." fn5[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal from an order of the district court denying appellant's Lozada claim shall be docketed as a new matter.] fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-06171
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06282
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2001. 01-06282