judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODNEY SHAFER, individually and d/b/a RENO TRANSPORT, and BRENDA SHAFER v. TNT WELL SERVICE, INC.

Case Heading (S-11-0258)
Case Number:S-11-0258Case Docketed On:11/03/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:RODNEY SHAFER, individually and d/b/a RENO TRANSPORT, and BRENDA SHAFER v. TNT WELL SERVICE, INC.
Full Title:RODNEY SHAFER, individually and d/b/a RENO TRANSPORT, and BRENDA SHAFER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. TNT WELL SERVICE, INC., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRodney ShaferRyan Justin Schwartz
Brian James Marvel
AppellantReno TransportRyan Justin Schwartz
Brian James Marvel
AppellantBrenda ShaferRyan Justin Schwartz
Brian James Marvel
AppelleeTNT Well Service, Inc.Terry L. Armitage
Curtis B. Buchhammer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 126
Citation:285 P.3d 958

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/03/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/03/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
11/03/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/07/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
12/16/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellants'MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' motion for extension of time; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs - appellant.Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
01/04/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/05/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Curtis B. Buchhammer for appelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Terry L. Armitage for appelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Curtis B. Buchhammer for appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Terry L. Armitage for appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/08/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Ryan J. Schwartz obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Terry L. Armitage obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/17/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ryan Schwartz for Appellant; Terry Armitage for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/17/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/26/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/12/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/12/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/18/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal