judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SION ASSIDON V. JENINE ABBOUSHI

Case Information: 11-FM-0447
Short Caption:SION ASSIDON V. JENINE ABBOUSHIClassification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Lead: 11-FM-0446 Consolidated:11-FM-0447, 11-FM-0448
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3870-10Filed Date:03/28/2011

Opening Event Date:03/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSion Assidon N
Stephen J. Cullen NN
AppelleeJenine Abboushi NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (no transcript needed)
04/07/2011STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S)
04/14/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal filed in these matters, and it appearing that no transcripts are needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-FM-446, 11-FM-447 & 11-FM-448 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court of the record idnexes and record copies in accordance wtih D.C. App. R. 119B)(3)(A). (JAC)
07/01/2011RECORD INDEX (11-FM-447)
07/01/2011RECORD INDEX (11-FM-448)
07/01/2011RECORD INDEX (11-FM-446)
07/01/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (dlm)
08/22/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/22/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledOrder directing motion & brief
12/01/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte - schedule before merits
12/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/06/2012FiledLetter From aple stating that a brief will not be filed (Appellee)
01/30/2012FiledORDER SUA SPONTE THAT CHILDRENS'S LAW CENTER IS ENTERED AS AN AMICUS CURIAE and the BRIEF OF AMICUS SHALL BE FILED W/N 60 DAYS
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/13/2012FiledSupplemental Record #1 (108 pages/Maddox 2/2/10 proceedings)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/12/2012FiledLetter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Appellant)Denied
03/19/2012FiledAnswer/Response to Apppellant's request for oral argument (Amicus Curiae)
03/22/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
03/30/2012FiledBrief (Amicus Curiae)
03/30/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Amicus Curiae)Granted
04/03/2012FiledSubmitted To Washington,Glickman,Farrell
04/05/2012FiledOrder Granting amicus curaie Childgren's Law Center's motion to file supplemental appendix.
04/05/2012FiledAppendix (Amicus Curiae)
06/28/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and farrell, Senior Judge.)
07/23/2012FiledMandate