judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD D. KELLY v. DUSTIN KILTS, Personal Representative of the Estate of Roxie Carol Kelly, Deceased

Case Heading (S-10-0090)
Case Number:S-10-0090Case Docketed On:04/23/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:RONALD D. KELLY v. DUSTIN KILTS, Personal Representative of the Estate of Roxie Carol Kelly, Deceased
Full Title:RONALD D. KELLY, Appellant (Defendant), v. DUSTIN KILTS, Personal Representative of the Estate of Roxie Carol Kelly, Deceased, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald D. KellyRichard H. Peek
AppelleeDustin KiltsRex O. Arney
Carrie Lynn Sisson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce
Opinion Number:2010 WY 151
Citation:243 P.3d 947 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/23/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/23/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/24/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/26/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, requested Statement of Costs be submitted electronicallyEventPhone CallFinal
05/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2010Affidavit - Affidavit of costs and expenses - statement of costs.AffidavitAffidavit of costs and expensesFinal
05/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of brief on cd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/28/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/02/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/10/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal