judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEIR VS. WEIR

Case Information: 38448
Short Caption:WEIR VS. WEIRCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D243097Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro-check no. 1168.
09/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15263
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-17355
10/17/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 15, 2001. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on October 4, 2001. 01-17505
10/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16717
10/18/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. David K. Robinson.
11/19/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-19363
11/19/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-19364
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-20816
12/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.