judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROGER SCOTT FLOWERS AND JOHN H. CARRELL v. DEMPSEY-TEGELER AND CO., INC.

Case: B-2697
B-2697
04/26/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ROGER SCOTT FLOWERS AND JOHN H. CARRELL
DEMPSEY-TEGELER AND CO., INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/28/1971Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/18/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/25/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/27/1971Opinion issued
09/28/1971Brief on the Merits
08/18/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/01/1971Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
05/25/1971Response to Petition
04/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/26/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dempsey-Tegeler and Co., Inc.Respondent
Roger Scott Flowers and John H. CarrellPetitioner
Attorney General of TexasAmicus Curiae
L. Vance Stanton and Scott BradleyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information