judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GANTT VS. DIST. CT.

Case Information: 38447
Short Caption:GANTT VS. DIST. CT.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 54800 , 58376
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175914-3Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-15257
09/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency/Writ. Due Date: 10 days (affidavit).
09/19/2001Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 01-15862
09/21/2001Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. 01-16010
10/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 'ORDER the petition DENIED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-17097
11/06/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-17304
11/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.