judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PHYLLIS J. OUTLAW & ASSOC. V. R. REA CORPORATION

Case Information: 11-DA-0008
Short Caption:PHYLLIS J. OUTLAW & ASSOC. V. R. REA CORPORATIONClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC2-000778-11Filed Date:04/08/2011

Opening Event Date:04/08/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerPhyllis J. Outlaw & AssociatesNPro SeN
RespondentR. Rea CorporationNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/08/2011APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL
04/08/2011FILING FEE of $10.00.
04/12/2011TMC - application for allowance of appeal - motion to stay
06/08/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION TO STAY Enforcement of Judgment Dated...June 7 2011 LW
06/22/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION
06/22/2011RECEIVED- respondent's oppo to petitoner's application motion to stay enforement of judgement dated 6/7/11
06/23/2011 ORDERED that AAA IS DENIED... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE to file the lodged opposition IS DENIED AS MOOT. (GLRDTE)