judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVE JOHN GRENZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT

Case Heading (S-10-0089)
Case Number:S-10-0089Case Docketed On:04/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:STEVE JOHN GRENZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT
Full Title:STEVE JOHN GRENZ, Appellant (Respondent), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteve John GrenzSue Davidson
AppelleeDepartment of Family Services - Child Support Enforcement DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Jill E. Kucera
Susan Kay Stipe

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support
Opinion Number:2011 WY 3
Citation:249 P.3d 694

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/21/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to extend deadline for filing brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/02/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, the State of Wyoming, Department of Family Services, Child Support Enforcement; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/07/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2010Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/10/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/10/2010Motion - Withdraw a DocumentMotionWithdraw a documentFinal
09/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw motion for extension; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/13/2010Order - Granting motion to withdraw motion for extensionOrderGrantFinal
09/20/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/11/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/31/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal