judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CABALLO COAL COMPANY v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Case Heading (S-10-0113)
Case Number:S-10-0113Case Docketed On:05/17/2010
Linked To: S-10-0112
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CABALLO COAL COMPANY v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Full Title:CABALLO COAL COMPANY, Appellant (Defendant), v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCaballo Coal Company, a Delaware CorporationBillie LM Addleman
Richard Alan Mincer
AppelleeUnion Pacific Railroad CompanyHoward P. Olsen Jr.
Steven W. Olsen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Civil Procedure, Contracts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 24
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/17/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/17/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/06/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2010Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Steven Olsen on behalf of appellee.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
07/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Admit Steven W. Olsen to Supreme Court Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Compliance issued by State Bar Office not attached to motion. Called Bar and they confirmed one had been issued.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/19/2010Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
08/16/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Union Pacific Railroad CompanyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Mincer and Billie LM Addleman for Caballo Coal Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Steven W. Olsen for UPRC.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/18/2010Motion - Other - to excuse local counsel from attending oral argument. Electronic document on Case No. S-10-0112.MotionOtherFinal
10/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to excuse local Wyoming counsel from attending oral argument; and affidavit in support of appellant's motion to excuse local counsel from attending oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/19/2010Order - Denying motion to excuse local counsel from attending oral argumentOrderDenyFinal
10/19/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Howard P. Olsen, Jr. and Steven W. Olsen, argument by Steven Olsen for UPRC; Billie LM Addleman and Richard Alan Mincer, argument by Mr. Addleman for Caballo Coal Company) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/19/2010Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument. Justice Voigt not attending.OrderOtherFinal
02/14/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/02/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/02/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/4/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal