judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONTE EVANS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0477
Short Caption:DONTE EVANS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-10128-09Filed Date:04/14/2011

Opening Event Date:04/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/26/2013
Argued/Submitted:10/31/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/27/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonte Evans Y
J Ashley EbersoleYN
Michele A. RobertsNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (60 pgs/Janifer) 5/20/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (96 pgs/Wood) 11/30/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (154 pgs/Wood) 12/1/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (210 pgs/Wood) 12/6/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (209 pgs/Wood) 12/7/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (80 pgs/Wood) 12/8/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (11 pgs/Wood) 12/10/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (114 pgs/Rogers) 12/13/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (15 pgs/Walker) 3/18/11 proc. w/cd
07/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (SEALED pleadings)
07/21/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/21/2011FiledRecord Index
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief 90 Days (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 11/21/11.
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to 90 days. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/20/12.
02/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/21/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/21/12.
05/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/13/12
06/28/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
08/29/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw James W. Klein, Esquire,(Appellant) and entered the appearances of Saul M. Pilchen, Esquire, and J. Ashley Ebersole, Esquire, as the pro bono counsel, and the brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
09/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/23/12.
11/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 1/7/13
01/07/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/07/2013FiledAppendix (Volume 1-3) (Appellant)
02/06/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
02/08/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 3/26/13
03/26/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/26/2013FiledBriefing Completed
04/05/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
04/15/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/23/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 6/21/13
04/25/2013FiledAppearance by Michele Roberts (Appellant)
05/03/2013FiledOrder withdrawing the appearance of Saul M. Pilchen, Esquire, and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Michele A. Roberts, Esquire, as pro bono counsel for appellant.
06/21/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/01/2013WithdrawnACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/15/2013FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Denied as Moot
08/19/2013FiledOrder Denying as moot aplt's motion for oral argument...
08/19/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/23/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
08/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/31/2013FiledArgued Before Assoicate Judges Fisher, Assoicate Blackburne-Rigsby, and Senior Judge King. (J Ashley Ebersole Esq. for Appellant) (Anne Y. Park, for Appellee).
11/05/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
12/11/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges; and King, Senior Judge)
12/24/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Denied
02/19/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing.
02/27/2014FiledMandate