judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOUGLAS LEE JOHNSON v. JUDITH ANN JOHNSON

Case Heading (S-11-0261)
Case Number:S-11-0261Case Docketed On:11/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DOUGLAS LEE JOHNSON v. JUDITH ANN JOHNSON
Full Title:DOUGLAS LEE JOHNSON, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JUDITH ANN JOHNSON, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDouglas Lee JohnsonRobert E. Schroth Sr.
AppelleeJudith Ann JohnsonRobert W. Horn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Counsel certified in NOA arrangements made for transcript--no transcript ordered)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/14/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
12/12/2011Event - Phone Call to Appellant re Motion to Dismiss. Received an unsigned copy, requested signed original.EventPhone CallFinal
12/19/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, second request for original copy of Motion to Dismiss appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
12/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal (Untimely, due 12/12/2011)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/27/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/27/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal