judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOUISE M. HUGHLEY-SMITH V. D.C. OFFICE OF PLANNING

Case Information: 11-AA-0475
Short Caption:LOUISE M. HUGHLEY-SMITH V. D.C. OFFICE OF PLANNINGClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OAH-OP-0000002Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLouise M. Hughley-Smith NPro SeN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Office of PlanningN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
04/20/2011FILING FEE of $100.00
04/21/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
05/11/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL w/n 20 days SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for either having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE order since a motion for relief is not independently appealable OR for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
05/11/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
05/31/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
06/30/2011 ORDERED that the PETITION IS DISMISSED as UNTIMELY... (BRNBKG)
06/30/2011DISMISSED
07/22/2011FiledMandate