judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF NEVADA, DEPT. OF TRANSP. VS. DIST. CT.

Case Information: 38444
Short Caption:STATE OF NEVADA, DEPT. OF TRANSP. VS. DIST. CT.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39188
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411588Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-15189
09/10/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Emergency Stay. 01-15190
09/10/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Exhibits in Support of State of Nevada on Relation of Its Department of Transportation's Motion for Emergency Stay and Petition for Writ of Manate. 01-15191
09/11/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Emergency Stay (filed via fax). 01-15341
09/12/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Original of Opposition to Motion for Emergency Stay filed on 9/11/01. 01-15394
09/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition and Denying Motion for a Stay. " . . . we deny the petition." The motion for a stay is denied as moot. NNP02-WM/DA/NB 01-15695
10/15/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-15927
10/15/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.