judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHON ANDERSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0086)
Case Number:S-10-0086Case Docketed On:04/20/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:SHON ANDERSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:SHON ANDERSON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShon AndersonMichael D. Newman
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kristen Jocelyn Hanna

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 157
Citation:245 P.3d 263

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/20/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received with attachments received. Requested from District Court Clerk, not attached to original notice of appeal. Order was referenced in NOA, but no order of that description appears to have been entered that day.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/20/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/20/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
04/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/23/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution filed in trial court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/04/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, brief unsigned requested signature page.EventPhone CallFinal
06/09/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re signature page. Received pages with copied signatureEventPhone CallFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Signature page of brief with originalNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/20/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/10/2010Event - Rejected Filing (Reply) Appellant's Brief, Untimely, submitted after 5:00 p.m. on 08/09/10EventRejected FilingFinal
08/10/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received rejected Reply Brief. Called counsel, he is aware that filing was untimely and will petition to late file. Hard copies of brief will be held until Court enters order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2010Motion - Accept late filingMotionAccept late filingFinal
08/16/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, received copies of motion, requested signed original.EventPhone CallFinal
08/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/23/2010Event - Phone Call re signed original copy of motion, will mail todayEventPhone CallFinal
08/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief That Was Rejected as a Late E-file SubmissionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/31/2010Order - Granting Consideration of Appellant's Reply BriefOrderGrantFinal
09/08/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/08/2010Event - Phone Call counsel for Appellant, requested signed original copy of Reply BriefEventPhone CallFinal
09/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2010Event - Other. Received notification from clerk of district court regarding second request for record on appeal. Request was mistakenly sent after the filing of late reply brief, and will be disregarded.EventOtherFinal
12/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/09/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, received copy of "Motion for Payment of Attorney Fees" in today's mail. Advised that this motion must be e-filed and after acceptance he will need to provide the Court with the original plus six copiesEventPhone CallFinal
12/15/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
12/17/2010Event - Phone Call from AG, they are not going to object to attorney fees requestEventPhone CallFinal
12/17/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, received copies of Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees in mail, no signed original copy, requested.EventPhone CallFinal
12/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Original copy of Motion for Payment of Attorney's FeesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal