judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SEWALD VS. OPPORTUNITY VILLAGE ARC, INC.

Case Information: 38459
Short Caption:SEWALD VS. OPPORTUNITY VILLAGE ARC, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34433 , 36133
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399693Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John R. Sewald-check no. 2476.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-15308
10/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Directing Transmission of Record. The order granting summary judgment was entered on July 30, 2001. The notice of appeal was filed on day late, on September 4, 2001, and thus fails to vest jurisdiction in this court. We therefore dismiss the appeal as to the July 30, 2001 order granting summary judgment. The judgment entered on August 1, 2001, did not alter the rights or obligations of the parties arising from the July 30, 2001, order in any way, but only added an award of costs. The August 1, 2001, order is appealable as a special order after final judgment to the extent that it awarded costs to respondent. Notice of entry of the August 1 judgment was served on August 8, 2001, and so the notice of appeal is timely as to this judgment, and vests jurisdiction in this court to the extent that the award of costs is challenged. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial court record pertaining to this appeal. fn7[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-16680
10/29/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Respondents' Motion to Stay Appeal Pending Resolution of Further Proceedings Regarding Insurance Carrier of Opportunity Village Arc, Inc. 01-18042
11/02/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 19. 01-18348
11/02/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[Appellant also attempted to appeal from an order granting summary judgment. His appeal from this order was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction by order dated October 1, 2001, because the notice of appeal was untimely. We deny appellant's request for rehearing of the order dismissing this portion of the appeal.] We conclude that the district court did not abuse its discretion in determining that the costs requested by respondent were allowable and reasonable. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn10[Although appellant was not granted leave to appear in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-21140
02/15/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Appellant has not demonstrated that rehearing of our order affirming the cost award is warranted, and we lack jurisdiction over an appeal from the summary judgment order, and so " . . . we deny rehearing." fn4[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him. Appellant's motion for a stay pending rehearing is denied as moot.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-03053
04/04/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed the petition, and we conclude that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. Accordingly, we deny the petition. "It is so ORDERED." EN BANC 02-05990
05/15/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed May 2, 2002 and placed on the docket as case no. 01-10048. 02-08504
10/14/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. 02-17695
10/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 14, 2002, the clerk of this court received notice that the United States Supreme Court denied appellant's petition on October 7, 2002. We deny appellant's motion to stay issuance of the remittitur, as moot, and direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur in this appeal. fn1[Although this court has not granted appellant leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's motion.] 02-17950
10/16/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 19 this day. 02-18007
10/16/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/30/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 21, 2002. 02-18007