judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. THOMPSON V. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

Case Information: 11-AA-0454
Short Caption:CHARLES E. THOMPSON V. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00516-11Filed Date:04/12/2011

Opening Event Date:04/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/20/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCharles E. Thompson YPro SeN
RespondentDepartment of Veterans AffairsN
Josh Hildreth NN
Elizabeth G. WhiteYN
R. Craig LawrenceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/12/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
04/12/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/22/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to April 12, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/22/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/23/2011APPEARANCE - of Josh Hildreth as counsel for the respondent
08/04/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/3/28/11 hearing
08/04/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/05/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/15/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
09/15/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner) incorporated in Brief.
10/06/2011FiledNotice Received from respondent substitution of counsel Elizabeth G. White substituting for Josh C. Hildreth (Respondent)
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 23, 2011 (Respondent)Granted
10/24/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 23, 2011 (Respondent)
11/23/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
11/23/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/20/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Easterly,Belson
04/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
05/14/2012FiledMandate