judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGGIE J. FORD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0459
Short Caption:REGGIE J. FORD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 09-CF-0359 Consolidated:11-CO-0459
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-2273-08Filed Date:04/11/2011

Opening Event Date:04/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantReggie J. Ford N
Bruce A. Johnson, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/12/2011ORDER DENYING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY AS MOOT. F/O that appellant's motion to consolidate is granted and appeals nos. 09-CF-359 and 11-CO-459 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that, in appeal no. 11-CO-459, counsel for appellant shall within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. F/O that appellant's failure to respond to any order of thei court, including this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. r. 13 (a). (ETW)
07/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeals
07/22/2011WithdrawnDismissed
07/28/2011FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (Appellant)Granted
08/17/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - to file statement regarding transcript out of time (statement regarding transcript attached as exhibit A) (Appellant)Granted
08/18/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Reinstate Appeals nos. 09-CF-359 & 11-CO-459 and lodged SRT is filed in appeal no. 11-CO-459.
08/18/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) in appeal no. 11-CO-459.
08/18/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/31/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CO-459)
08/31/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CO-459)
09/27/2011FiledBrief (Appdx Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension to file brief on 12/1/11.
12/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/22/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/16/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/10/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Pryor
05/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
05/22/2012FiledMotion requesting appointmenet and/or voucher for reprentation of Ford in connectin with the appeal of the denial of his ineffective assistance of counsel claim (Appellant)Granted
06/01/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion requesting appointment....
01/09/2013FiledMandate
07/08/2013FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and reinstate the appeal (Appellant)Denied
07/10/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE//ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE//APPELLEE'S MOTION TO FILE OPPO//MOTION TO FILE REPLY
07/31/2013FiledSupplemental Record #12 (44-pgs/Armstrong 11/12/08 proc.)
10/29/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte filing appendix and directing a response to the motion to recall the mandate no later than November 27, 2103 and holding motion to recall mandate in abeyance. GLOBPY
10/29/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/18/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a reply to appellee's response (Appellant)Granted
11/25/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File opposition to motion to recall the mandate and reinstate the appeal. (Appellee)Granted
01/29/2014FiledORDER GRANTING the MOTIONS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME and the CLERK SHALL FILE the lodged OPPOSITION and REPLY and DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECALL the MANDATE
01/29/2014FiledOpposition to motion to recall the mandate and reinstate the appeal (Appellee)
01/29/2014FiledReply to Opposition to Motion to Recall the Mandate and Reinstate the Appeal (Appellant)
03/06/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET
05/05/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
05/07/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to July 14, 2014.
05/19/2014FiledLetter From Pro Se Appellant requesting additional time to file Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc because of surgery in the next few weeks (Appellant)
05/20/2014FiledLetter To counsel re: appellant's 5/19/14, letter
05/29/2014FiledLetter From Bruce A. Johnson advising the Court that his work was completed two years ago. (Appellant)
06/04/2014FiledLetter To Brand, Esq. re appellant's 5/19/14,letter and mandate issuance on 1/9/13
06/12/2014FiledLetter From Appellant requesting extension of time to file Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
06/16/2014FiledLetter To Brand, Esq. re: appellant's 6/12/14, letter
07/01/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/21/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
08/11/2014FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A PET REHEARING/EN BANC
09/03/2014FiledMotion To Reconsider Pursuant to Rule 27 (b) (Appellant)Denied
09/04/2014FiledTMC//MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
09/04/2014FiledLetter From Pro Se Appellant - Male Custody Classification Form (Appellant)
09/05/2014FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION