judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEAL (MELVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38458
Short Caption:DEAL (MELVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P1589Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-15295
09/13/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/25/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/5/01. Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. 01-16191
10/03/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 24, 2001. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 01-16609
10/04/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Notice of Amended Transcript Request. Transcripts requested: April 24, 2001. To Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 01-16736
10/17/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17518
10/17/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-17519
10/31/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18240
02/13/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-02858
03/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02909
03/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2002. 02-02909