judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERELE CRAIG COTHREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0100)
Case Number:S-10-0100Case Docketed On:05/05/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JERELE CRAIG COTHREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJerele Craig CothrenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/21/2010Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
06/21/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants Motion to Stay Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/07/2010Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
08/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
08/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received Appellant's Status Report (No action necessary)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
09/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/02/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal