Case: B-2689
B-2689
04/20/1971
Application for Writ of Error
JIMMY PARTIN, III, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF LEWIS DE CORDOVA
VIRGINIA DE CORDOVA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/30/1971 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/30/1971 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
04/22/1971 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/20/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/09/1971 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/30/1971 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/09/1971 | Letter Filed | | ||
04/30/1971 | Reply to Response | | ||
04/22/1971 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/20/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
04/20/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Virginia de Cordova | Respondent | |
Jimmy Partin, III, Administrator of the Estate of Lewis de Cordova | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information