judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHANA D. MILES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0458
Short Caption:SHANA D. MILES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-26986-09Filed Date:04/11/2011

Opening Event Date:04/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ademuyiwa BamiduroYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sicilia Englert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sicilia Englert, Esquire
05/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/19/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcripts
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4 pgs/tape) 7/22/10 proc.
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (57 pgs/tape) 1/26/11 proc.
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (28 pgs/Armstrong) 1/31/11 proc.
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (29-169 pgs/Armstrong) 2/1/11 proc.
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (170-179 pgs/Armstrong) 2/2/11 proc.
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (14 pgs/tape) 4/7/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/25/2011FiledRecord Index
07/25/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/05/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (Sup Crt filings)
09/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief for 45 days (no oppo) (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/31/11.
10/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/27/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/23/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Farrell
07/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge)
08/21/2012FiledMandate
10/11/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)