judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONTY SULLIVAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0099)
Case Number:S-10-0099Case Docketed On:05/05/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MONTY SULLIVAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MONTY SULLIVAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMonty Dwayne SullivanDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 46
Citation:247 P.3d 879

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/07/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from court reporter indicating that she had inadvertently missed a motion hearing transcript, it has been completed and will be filed with the clerk and sent to the public defender.EventPhone CallFinal
06/09/2010Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion (Amended)RecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
06/11/2010Correspondence - Incoming from District Court Clerk regarding additional transcriptCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/17/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/18/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/06/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/14/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District CourtNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk A. Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/11/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court. Justice Voigt filed a special concurrence.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/31/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/30/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/20/2011Event - Other - received pro se Motion for Rehearing/Reconsideration, and returned to Mr. Sullivan without filing.EventOtherFinal
05/02/2011Event - Rejected Filing - received motion for rehearing again with letter regarding prisoner mail. Returned without filing.EventRejected FilingFinal
09/19/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court petition for writ of certiorari filed.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court petition for writ of certiorari deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal