judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYLOR VS. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

Case Information: 38457
Short Caption:TAYLOR VS. ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CARCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A403294Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/16/2002 / Dentico, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann - check no. 16883.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15294
09/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days.
10/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-17742
10/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 22, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement, received on October 12, 2001. To date appellants have failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. 01-17873
10/24/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-17256
11/02/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-18380
11/02/2001Other Other. Appellants' Statement of Evidence for Proceedings Pursuant to NRAP 9(d). 04/17/02 ORDER: STRICKEN. 01-18381
01/07/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 11, 2002. 02-00411
02/11/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: UPS 02/10/02. Signed by: Alan W. Westbrook. 04/17/02 ORDER: STRICKEN AND ORIGINAL BRIEF RETURNED. 02-02727
02/11/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 04/17/02 ORDER: STRICKEN AND ORIGINAL APPENDIX, VOLS. 1 AND 2 RETURNED. 02-02728
03/11/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 03/09/02. Signed by: Marc S. Cwik. 04/17/02 ORDER: STRICKEN AND ORIGINAL BRIEF RETURNED. 02-04368
03/11/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 04/17/02 ORDER: STRICKEN AND ORIGINAL APPENDIX RETURNED. 02-04369
04/12/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 10, 2002. 02-06586
04/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 2, 2001 appellants filed a 'Statement of Evidence for Proceedings Pursuant to NRAP 9(d).' Because appellants did not follow the proper procedures of NRAP 9(d), the statement of evidence is not properly part of the appellate court record, and cannot be considered by this court in its review of this appeal. The clerk of this court shall strike the statement of evidence that was filed on November 2, 2001. As portions of the opening brief rely on that statement of evidence, the clerk shall strike the opening brief and appendix that were filed on February 11, 2002. Also, because the answering brief discusses the statement of evidence, the clerk of this court shall strike the answering brief and appendix that were filed on March 11, 2002. The clerk of this court shall return the stricken briefs and appendices to the parties so that they may be utilized to the extent possible in filing corrected briefs. Appellants shall file and serve a corrected opening brief and appendix within 60 days from the date of this order. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-06861
04/17/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Perry & Spann. Returned the original Stricken Opening Brief and Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
04/17/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Pyatt & Silvestri. Returned the original Stricken Answering Brief and Appendix.
06/17/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 06/14/02. 02-10496
06/17/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-10497
06/24/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Deleted Gerald Sarkios Shmavonian as a respondent.
06/28/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on Fed-Ex 6/27/02. 02-11145
06/28/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-11146
07/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because all parties are now represented by counsel, the clerk of this court shall issue a notice assigning this appeal to the settlement program. We suspend the briefing schedule pending further order of this court. 02-11662
07/16/2002Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/27/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 1, 2002. 02-16789
11/08/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 6, 2002. 02-19305
01/24/2003Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 03-01354
02/11/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 03-02402
02/11/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.