judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF K. ALEXANDRA MONACO, ESQ.

Case Information: 78882
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF K. ALEXANDRA MONACO, ESQ.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/10/2019How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/03/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived-Bar Matter/Bar Discipline. (SC)
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1-247. (SC) 19-23910
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 248-435. (SC) 19-23911
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 436-552. (SC) 19-23913
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 553-655. (SC) 19-23914
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 656-713. (SC) 19-23915
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 714-768. (SC) 19-23916
06/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 769-907. (SC) 19-23917
06/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC) 19-23924
06/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 908-1107. (SC) 19-24091
06/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1108-1322. (SC) 19-24092
06/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1323-1468. (SC) 19-24093
06/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1509-1550. (SC) 19-24096
06/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1592-1652. (SC) 19-24102
06/04/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1653-1710. (SC) 19-24243
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1711-1762. (SC) 19-24295
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1763-1878. (SC) 19-24296
06/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1 continued (1879-1884) through Volume 2, pages (1885-2050). (SC) 19-24297
07/10/2019Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)
07/10/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1469-508. (SC) 19-29317
07/10/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Filed Record of Bar - Volume 1, pages 1551-1591. (SC) 19-29370
07/15/2019Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Rejecting Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. "We conclude that the agreed-upon discipline is insufficient to serve the purpose of attorney discipline. Accordingly, we reject the conditional guilty plea. Any future conditional guilty plea agreement should require Monaco to return any unearned fees to her clients and, if those clients cannot be located, she can pay those fees to the State Bar Client's Security Fund." SNP19 - JH/LS/AS. (SC) 19-29971
08/09/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC). 19-33522
08/09/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
08/26/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on August 14, 2019. (SC) 19-33522