judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BANK OF AMERICA VS. BOURDEAU

Case Information: 38449
Short Caption:BANK OF AMERICA VS. BOURDEAUCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31288 , 40109
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9500819Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Leavitt, MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Shearing for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/17/2001 / Evans, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hale firm-check no. 049920.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15265
09/25/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: George V. Allison. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/25/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-16181
10/02/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. 01-16589
10/17/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Margaret Springgate Evans.
11/13/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard & Anderson.
11/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement . Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-18943
12/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-20268
12/06/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Margaret Springgate Evans.
02/27/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Letter received from Settlement Judge Margaret Evans proposing that either (1) she recuse herself and allow the Supreme Court to appoint a different settlement judge or (2) that they meet and attempt to settle the case. 02-03653
06/10/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 26, 2002. 02-10068
07/01/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-11265
07/16/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We defer ruling on respondent's September 25, 2001 motion ot dismiss, pending further order of this court.] 02-12168
08/01/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
08/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondent's motion, and " . . . we dismiss this appeal." SNP02-CY/MS/DA 02-13910
09/10/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14169
09/10/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2002. 02-14169