judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHELLE KENYON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0091)
Case Number:S-10-0091Case Docketed On:04/23/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:MICHELLE KENYON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:MICHELLE KENYON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichelle KenyonDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 14
Citation:247 P.3d 845 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/23/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/23/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/30/2010Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Donna Domonkos. She received a call from Jody James regarding the docketing letter she received. Donna Domonkos was substituted as counsel 3/12/10 in the District Court and was on the notification letter from the clerk. Deleted Ms. James and added Ms. Domonkos as counsel and mailed her a copy of the docketing letter.EventPhone CallFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of notice of substitution of counsel for James Causey filed in the district court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/09/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief (wrong case number on electronic pleadings, should be S-10-0091)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/10/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Michelle Kenyon and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/23/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Michelle KenyonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/31/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court clerkNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/31/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/31/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/02/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/02/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/28/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal