Case Information: 13-FM-1517 | |||
Short Caption: | GABRIELLA LANDINEZ V. MARK WITASCHEK | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DRB3301-12 | Filed Date: | 11/08/2013 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/08/2013 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 12/09/2014 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/12/2015 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/05/2015 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/16/2015 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Gabriella Landinez | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Mark Witaschez | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
11/08/2013 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
04/01/2014 | Filed | Initial Order - directing statement regarding transcript | ||
04/18/2014 | Filed | Record Index | ||
04/30/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant) | ||
05/29/2014 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant) | Granted | |
06/09/2014 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant) | ||
06/09/2014 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
06/17/2014 | Filed | Motion To Reconsider leave granted to appellant (Appellee) | Denied | |
07/14/2014 | Filed | Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Appellant) | Denied | |
07/14/2014 | Lodged | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
07/29/2014 | Filed | Order Denying Motion To Reconsider leave granted to appellant (Appellee) | ||
07/29/2014 | Filed | Order Denying Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Appellant) | ||
07/29/2014 | Filed | Order - directing status of transcripts | ||
08/18/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to order and pay for transcirpts. (Appellant) | Granted | |
08/27/2014 | Filed | Opposition to appellant's motion extension of time to order and pay for transcripts (Appellee) | ||
09/10/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to order and pay for transcripts. (Appellant) - 10/3/14 | ||
10/03/2014 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
11/14/2014 | Filed | Order - directing transcripts receipts | ||
11/24/2014 | Filed | Answer/Response to order regarding proof of payment for transcripts. (Appellant) | ||
12/09/2014 | Filed | Supplemental Record#1 (8-pgs/tape 4/12/13 proc.) | ||
12/09/2014 | Filed | Supplemental Record#2(5-pgs/tape 5/17/13 proc.) | ||
12/09/2014 | Filed | Supplemental Record #3 (156-pgs/tape 7/9/13 proc. | ||
12/09/2014 | Filed | Supplemental Record#4 (95-pgs/tape 7/19/13 proc.) | ||
12/09/2014 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/12/2014 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
01/21/2015 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
01/23/2015 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal for want of prosecution (Appellee) | Denied | |
01/28/2015 | Filed | Opposition to motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee) | ||
02/18/2015 | Lodged | Opposition to motion to dismiss for want of prosecution and for attorney fees (Appellant) | ||
02/25/2015 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant) | Granted | |
02/27/2015 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) - 3/20/15 | ||
03/02/2015 | Filed | Opposition to motion to dismiss for want of prosecution and for attorney fees (Appellant) | ||
03/20/2015 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
03/20/2015 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
04/21/2015 | Filed | Order directing brief (Appellee) | ||
05/12/2015 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
05/12/2015 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/16/2015 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
10/02/2015 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
11/05/2015 | Filed | Submitted To Associate Judge Easterly, Associate Judge Fisher, and Senior Judge Pryor. (Dominic G. Vorv, Esquire Deidra L. McEachern, Esquire) | ||
11/23/2015 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Pryor, Senior Judge) | ||
12/16/2015 | Filed | Mandate |