judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARR VS. UNIVERSITY OF NEVADA

Case Information: 38441
Short Caption:CARR VS. UNIVERSITY OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A420228Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15109
09/07/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/07/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: September 12, 2001. 01-15898
09/20/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Grenville Pridham - check no. 2312.
09/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16293
10/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-16683
02/06/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Deleted respondents Black Mountain Studios and Winsor Harmon.
02/19/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Walter L. Ayers regarding the caption in this case. 02-03121
02/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal are hereby suspended pending further order of this court. 02-03198
02/21/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-03332
02/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 21, 2002. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on February 14, 2002. We remind the parties that on February 20, 2002, this court entered an order suspending the briefing schedule in this appeal. Accordingly, no further briefs shall be filed pending further order of this court. 02-03366
02/22/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on:02/12/02. Signed by Grenville Pridham. 02-02941
02/22/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-02942
04/01/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Deleesa Carr's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. 02-05828
04/16/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Supplement Deleesa Carr's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. 02-06803
04/19/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn3[We grant Ms. Carr's motion to supplement her response, and direct the clerk of this court to file the affidavit received on April 16, 2002.] "We affirm the district court's order dismissing Ms. Carr's complaint." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-06979
04/19/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Deleesa Carr in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. 02-06804
05/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-07352
05/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 16, 2002. 06/10/02 ORDER: REMITTITUR RECALLED. 02-07352
06/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Recalling Remittitur. On May 14, 2002, the remittitur issued and this case was closed. On May 28, 2002, appellant submitted, in proper person, a petition for rehearing. fn1[Although the document is entitled, 'Order to Show Cause,' appellant is clearly requesting this court to reconsider the April 19, 2002, Order of Affirmance.] It appears that the document may have been timely mailed, but not received by the clerk's office until May 28, 2002, due to an error made in addressing the envelope that the document was originally mailed in, we hereby recall the remittitur. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for rehearing. The clerk of this court shall amend the docket of this appeal to reflect that attorney Grenville T. Pridham is no longer counsel of record for appellant, and that appellant is proceeding in proper person. Appellant shall file a copy of the petition with her signature within 15 days from the date of this order. No action will be taken on the petition until a signed copy is filed with this court. 02-10004
06/10/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. 02-09298
06/12/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from appellant Carr stating that she will be out of town until July 1, 2002. If a response comes up regarding a proper person petition for rehearing, she may be reached following July 9, 2002.
07/10/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." Fn1 [Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the document received from appellant.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-11767
07/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-12722
07/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 1, 2002. 02-12722