judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOBBIE JO TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0083)
Case Number:S-10-0083Case Docketed On:04/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:BOBBIE JO TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BOBBIE JO TUCKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBobbie Jo TuckerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/13/2010Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
05/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/08/2010Order - Stay briefing. Appellant shall keep this Court apprised of proceedingsOrderStay briefingFinal
07/27/2010System - Status check - other - Called the District Court regarding case. They stated an order was entered in this case on July 12, 2010. Called the Public Defender and requested update and/or copy of order on this case.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
07/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
07/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Status ReportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/13/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and WaiverEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal